This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 15:31:02 (UTC).

Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 Insight Public Sector, Inc , a Illinois Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1994

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation

Defendants

Does 1-50

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey M Galen

Defendant Attorney

Daniel W Robertson

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff))

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Request Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Request Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) filed

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time) filed

Order - Other (Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time) filed

Motion to Strike filed

Motion to Strike filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Daniel Robertson) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Daniel Robertson) filed

Proposed Order filed

Proposed Order filed

Demurrer filed

Demurrer filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Daniel Robertson) filed

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Daniel Robertson) filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed

Notice of Errata filed

Notice of Errata filed

Motion to Strike filed

Motion to Strike filed

Demurrer filed

Demurrer filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 06/21/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Robertson, Daniel W added as a effective 02/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Strike filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Errata filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion to Strike filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Request Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint) filed; Filed By: State of California(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Insight Public Sector, Inc., a Illinois Corporation(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel William Robertson