This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 04:00:56 (UTC).

In the matter of Rose Marie Bolds

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 In the matter of Rose Marie Bolds was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8909

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Thornton, Charlottte W.

Defendant

Rose Marie Bolds

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David Butler, Jr

 

Court Documents

Petition to Establish Claim of Ownership or Conveyance or Transfer of Property (Prob Code 850)(Case Initiation) filed.

Petition to Establish Claim of Ownership or Conveyance or Transfer of Property (Prob Code 850)(Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition to Establish Claim of Ownership or Conveyance or Transfer of Property (Prob Code 850)(Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Charlottte(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less