Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 08:58:09 (UTC).

In the matter of Martha Marie Coverdale

Case Summary

On 02/22/2018 In the matter of Martha Marie Coverdale was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7484

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Treadway, Patricia

Claimants

Citrus Heights Water District

Department of Health Services

Treadway, David

Decedent

Coverdale, Martha Marie

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Administrator

Miguel, Kristin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Leslie A Arnal

Administrator Attorney

Borden D Webb

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/29/2019 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/29/2019 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/19/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/19/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/09/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/09/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/09/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/09/2018 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Treadway, David(Claimant))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed.

Declaration - Other (Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice) filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Services(Claimant))

Declaration - Other (Dismissal of Creditor's Claim) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dismissal of Creditor's Claim) filed. (Filed By: Department of Health Services(Claimant))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Citrus Heights Water District(Claimant))

Will of Martha Coverdale Admitted into Probate

Will of Martha Coverdale Admitted into Probate

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed.

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

Letters of Special Administration filed.

Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Settling FIRST and FINAL FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT and Report of Administrator with Will Annexed and Petition for its Settlement, for Approval of Payment of Two Creditor's Claims; for Reimbursement to Former Personal representative; etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/29/2019 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/29/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Administrator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Webb, Borden D added as a effective 03/06/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Treadway, David(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Treadway, David added as a Claimant effective 02/28/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 02/22/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/09/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Subscribing Witness filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Subscribing Witness filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Treadway, Patricia(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citrus Heights Water District is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borden D Webb