This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/25/2019 at 04:00:17 (UTC).

In the matter of Kenneth Lewis Keeton

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 In the matter of Kenneth Lewis Keeton was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3574

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Keeton, Marilyn

Decedent

Keeton, Kenneth Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dustin Macfarlane

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/02/2019 11:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/02/2019 11:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/02/2019 11:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/02/2019 at 11:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Keeton, Marilyn(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Macfarlane