This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/13/2019 at 04:00:37 (UTC).

In the matter of Judith Arlene Kirby

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 In the matter of Judith Arlene Kirby was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9053

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dexter, Alexandria

Decedent

Kirby, Judith Arlene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tonya Nygren

 

Court Documents

Letters of Special Administration filed.

Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Order For Probate (Special Admin.)

Order For Probate (Special Admin.)

Ex Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2020 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2020 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Order Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

Order Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with limited authority filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with limited authority filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/14/2020 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder For Probate (Special Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/14/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with limited authority filed. (Filed By: Dexter, Alexandria(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less