This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/23/2022 at 13:25:41 (UTC).

In the matter of Janet E Page

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 In the matter of Janet E Page was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6063

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Page Jr, Lloyd Lee

Claimants

City of Folsom Fire Department Ambulance Service

Discover Bank

Decedent

Page, Janet E.

Not Classified By Court

Miller, Paul D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Samuel K Swenson

 

Court Documents

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 08/12/2021 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 08/12/2021 .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner))

Proof of Service (zoom) filed.

Proof of Service (zoom) filed. (Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed

Proof of Publication filed

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Creditor's Claim filed

Creditor's Claim filed

Order Appointing Executor (DE-140) filed

Order Appointing Executor (DE-140) filed

Letters filed

Letters filed

Notice to Creditors filed

Notice to Creditors filed

Creditor's Claim filed

Creditor's Claim filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: City of Folsom Fire Department Ambulance Service added as a Claimant effective 03/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Creditor's Claim filed; Filed By: City of Folsom Fire Department Ambulance Service(Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice to Creditors filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Letter issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Letters filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Executor (DE-140) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Discover Bank added as a Claimant effective 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Creditor's Claim filed; Filed By: Discover Bank(Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Court appointed Paul D. Miller as the Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Publication filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service (zoom) filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Zoom Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 08/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed; Filed By: Page, Lloyd(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Folsom is a litigant

Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWENSON, SAMUEL K.