This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/23/2022 at 01:32:17 (UTC).

In the matter of Henry High

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 In the matter of Henry High was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0913

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

High, Michelle

Decedent

High, Henry

Not Classified By Court

Miller, Paul D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Samuel K Swenson

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM published

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed

Notice to Creditors filed

Letters filed

Letters filed

Order Appointing Administrator

Order Appointing Administrator

Letters submitted by High, Michelle rejected on 11/02/2021

Letters submitted by High, Michelle rejected on 11/02/2021

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

Declaration - Other (Verified Responses To Probate Notes Dated July 23, 2021) filed

Declaration - Other (Verified Responses To Probate Notes Dated July 23, 2021) filed

Response to Calendar Notes filed

Response to Calendar Notes filed

Response to Calendar Notes filed

Response to Calendar Notes filed

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Proof of Service (Zoom Hearing) filed.

Proof of Service (Zoom Hearing) filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

Notice - Other (zoom notice) filed.

Notice - Other (zoom notice) filed. (Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner))

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice to Creditors filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Letters filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Letters submitted by High, Michelle rejected on 11/02/2021; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/28/2021 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Court appointed Paul D. Miller as the Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition is granted. The Court appoints Michaelle High as Administrator of the estate of Henry High on 09/28/21, Letters are to issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Miller, Paul D. appointed as Probate Referee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Verified Responses To Probate Notes Dated July 23, 2021) filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Publication filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond Heir or Beneficiary) filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service (Zoom Hearing) filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (zoom notice) filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed; Filed By: High, Michelle(Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SWENSON, SAMUEL K.