This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/19/2022 at 14:38:31 (UTC).

In the matter of Garrett Paul Nyland

Case Summary

On 08/10/2022 In the matter of Garrett Paul Nyland was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5059

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nyland, Kelly

Decedent

Nyland, Garrett Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Timothy P Murphy

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed

Proof of Service (zoom) filed

Proof of Service (zoom) filed

Notice - Other (Notice of Remote Appearance) filed

Notice - Other (Notice of Remote Appearance) filed

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/29/2022 09:00:00 AM published

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/29/2022 09:00:00 AM published

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Hearing - Probate; Department: 129; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/29/2022 09:00:00 AM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed; Filed By: Nyland, Kelly(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed; Filed By: Nyland, Kelly(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (Notice of Remote Appearance) filed; Filed By: Nyland, Kelly(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service (zoom) filed; Filed By: Nyland, Kelly(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/29/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/19/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 129

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed; Filed By: Nyland, Kelly(Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy P Murphy