This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 18:35:22 (UTC).

In the matter of Dennis M. Ripley

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 In the matter of Dennis M Ripley was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7427

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Miguel, Kristin

Conservatee

Ripley, Dennis M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dustin Macfarlane

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Death filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketAffidavit - Other (Nomination Of Conservator And Waiver Of Notice) filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/11/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketZoom Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNotification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketVerification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDuties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Miguel, Kristin(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dustin Macfarlane