Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/02/2021 at 16:00:34 (UTC).

In the matter of Anakin Luc Gacutan Custodio

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 In the matter of Anakin Luc Gacutan Custodio was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8596

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Luc, Mansan

Minor

Gacutan Custodio, Anakin Luc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Judith H Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Hearing - Guardianship Probate; Department: 129; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Petition for Hearing - Guardianship Probate; Department: 129; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Zoom) filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Zoom) filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketLetters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Guardianship Probate scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Guardian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Guardian of Minor - Person & Estate filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketConsent of Proposed Guardian, Nomination of Guardian, and Consent to Appointment of Guardian and Waiver of Notice filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDuties of Guardian filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNative American Ancestry Questionaire filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Guardianship Probate scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Other (zoom notice) filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Luc, Mansan(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Judith H Clark