This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/13/2019 at 04:00:40 (UTC).

In the matter of Altha Davis

Case Summary

On 11/15/2019 In the matter of Altha Davis was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9058

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Davis Jr, Lambert

Decedent

Davis, Altha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tonya Nygren

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Order For Probate (Special Admin.)

Order For Probate (Special Admin.)

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed.

Declaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Ex Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

Order Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

Order Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

Letters of Special Administration filed.

Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration re Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (Petn for letters of special admin) filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Determining Disposition Of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder For Probate (Special Admin.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 01/09/2020 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Davis, Lambert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less