This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/27/2023 at 03:36:19 (UTC).

I V vs. I J

Case Summary

On 08/02/2022 I filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against vs I J. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4622

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Desmond, Marisa Jasmin

V, I

V, I M.

Defendants

Consumnes River College

Does 1-50

Elk Grove Unified School District

J, I

Los Rios Community College District

Valley High School

Andrew Johnson

Guardian Ad Litem

Desmond, Eduardo Enrique

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Case C Barnett

Defendant Attorney

Ross R Nott

 

Court Documents

Reply (to Demurrer) filed

Reply (to Demurrer) filed

Reply (to Non Opp to Motion to Strike) filed

Reply (to Non Opp to Motion to Strike) filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/16/2023 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/16/2023 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 03/16/2023 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 03/16/2023 09:00:00 AM

Notice - Other (of Non Opposition) filed

Notice - Other (of Non Opposition) filed

Reply (on Demurrer) filed

Reply (on Demurrer) filed

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/03/2023 09:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/03/2023 09:30:00 AM

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/03/2023 09:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/03/2023 09:30:00 AM published

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

Motion to Strike (Portions of Complaint) filed

Motion to Strike (Portions of Complaint) filed

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2024
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Rescheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply (to Demurrer) filed; Filed By: Los Rios Community College District(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply (to Non Opp to Motion to Strike) filed; Filed By: Los Rios Community College District(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Andrew Johnson(Defendant); Elk Grove Unified School District(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application - Other (Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading) filed; Filed By: V, I(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Desmond, Marisa Jasmin rejected on 08/09/2022; Filed By: Desmond, Marisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Desmond, Marisa Jasmin rejected on 08/09/2022; Filed By: Desmond, Marisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Desmond, Marisa Jasmin rejected on 08/09/2022; Filed By: Desmond, Marisa(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: V, I(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: V, I(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Desmond, Marisa(Plaintiff); V, I(Plaintiff); V, I(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Desmond, Marisa(Plaintiff); V, I(Plaintiff); V, I(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less