This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 23:37:01 (UTC).

Holt of California vs. Folsom Diesel Works LLC

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Holt of California filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Folsom Diesel Works LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9022

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holt of California

Defendants

Does 1-10

Folsom Diesel Works LLC

Bassham, Kevin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan L Brodkin

Defendant Attorney

John M Latini

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

Motion to Compel - Other (Form and Special Interrogatories) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (Form and Special Interrogatories) filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bassham, Kevin(Defendant); Folsom Diesel Works LLC(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel - Other (Form and Special Interrogatories) filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketLatini, John M added as a effective 08/12/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bassham, Kevin(Defendant); Folsom Diesel Works LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/21/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Holt of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holt of California, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN