This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 04:55:22 (UTC).

Heather Molesworth vs. Russell Poteat

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Heather Molesworth filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Russell Poteat. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4789

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Molesworth, Heather

Defendants

Poteat, Russell

Work, Margeate

Work, Sean

Does 1-30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brad A Schultz

John N Demas

Defendant Attorney

Justin J McKenna

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons submitted by Molesworth, Heather rejected on 09/16/2020 .

Summons submitted by Molesworth, Heather rejected on 09/16/2020 . (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Poteat, Russell(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons submitted by Molesworth, Heather rejected on 09/16/2020 . (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons submitted by Molesworth, Heather rejected on 09/16/2020 . (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Molesworth, Heather(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schultz, Brad A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John N Demas