This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 09/23/2023 at 01:08:28 (UTC).

Geoffrey Michael Brown vs. Artem Karagadyan

Case Summary

On 11/14/2022 Geoffrey Michael Brown filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Artem Karagadyan. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geoffrey Michael Brown

Defendant

Artem Karagadyan

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Minute Order (Case Management Conference - Case Management Program)

08/18/2023; Minute Order (Case Management Conference - Case Management Program)

Tentative Case Management Order

08/08/2023; Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

08/04/2023; Case Management Statement

Notice of Remote Appearance

08/04/2023; Notice of Remote Appearance

Case Management Statement

08/04/2023; Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

08/01/2023; Case Management Statement

Notice of Remote Appearance

08/01/2023; Notice of Remote Appearance

Substitution of Attorney

06/30/2023; Substitution of Attorney

Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 6/15 Motions to Compel(2)

06/05/2023; Correspondence Re: Letter to Drop 6/15 Motions to Compel(2)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

05/23/2023; Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proposed Order Granting MTC Production of Documents

04/21/2023; Proposed Order Granting MTC Production of Documents

Separate Statement ISO MTC Production of Documents

04/21/2023; Separate Statement ISO MTC Production of Documents

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Production of Documents

04/21/2023; Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Production of Documents

Proposed Order Granting Mtn to compel

04/21/2023; Proposed Order Granting Mtn to compel

Separate Statement ISO of Plfs Mtn to compel further responses

04/21/2023; Separate Statement ISO of Plfs Mtn to compel further responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Special Interrogatories Set 1

04/21/2023; Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Special Interrogatories Set 1

Association of Attorney

03/17/2023; Association of Attorney

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • HearingMessage: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Gordon D. Schaber Superior Court at Department 43 updated: Result Date to 08/18/2023 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Minute Order (Case Management Conference - Case Management Program)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference - Case Management Program); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Tentative Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • DocketMessage: Tentative Case Management Order; Category: Tentative Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Case Management Statement; Filed By: Doordash, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed By: Doordash, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Case Management Statement; Filed By: Artem Karagadyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Doordash, Inc (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Remote Appearance Filed by: Doordash, Inc (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Summons; Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Notice of Case Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketName: RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/15/2022 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: Brown, Geoffrey Michael (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 43 .; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less