This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 23:00:47 (UTC).

Gary R Wisner MD vs. Dignity Health

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 Gary R Wisner MD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7761

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wisner MD, Gary R.

Defendants

Dignity Health

Does 1-30

Methodist Hospital of Sacramento

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theresa J Barta

Defendant Attorney

Barry S Landberg

 

Court Documents

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (EFS-005) filed.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (EFS-005) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Colin M McGrath ISO defs Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Colin M McGrath ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO defs Demurrer) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO defs Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

Objection (to defs Request for Judicial Notice Filed ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer) filed.

Objection (to defs Request for Judicial Notice Filed ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Theresa Barta Filed ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Theresa Barta Filed ISO plfs Opp to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

Reply (Brief ISO Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint) filed.

Reply (Brief ISO Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Reply Brief ISO Demurrer) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Reply Brief ISO Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

Objection (to Declaration of Theresa Barta) filed.

Objection (to Declaration of Theresa Barta) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/20/2021 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/20/2021 01:30:00 PM .

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (Second) filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/20/2021 01:30:00 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 01/20/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 12/09/2020 01:30:00 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply (Brief ISO Demurrer to 1st Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (ISO Reply Brief ISO Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address (EFS-005) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dignity Health(Defendant); Methodist Hospital of Sacramento(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wisner MD, Gary(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/06/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/05/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Methodist Hospital of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landsberg, Barry S