This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 13:31:54 (UTC).

Garrett Kidd vs. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Garrett Kidd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9399

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kidd, Garrett

Defendants

Does 1-10

International Fidelity Insurance Company

R.L. Niello Co., Inc.

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael H Rosenstein

Defendant Attorney

Sean P Conboy

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Statement of Damages filed.

Statement of Damages filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/08/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Damages filed. (Filed By: Kidd, Garrett(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 38 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R L NIELLO, INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONBOY SEAN P