This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 18:55:38 (UTC).

Frederick Henry vs. Richard Salaun

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Frederick Henry filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Richard Salaun. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5043

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Henry, Frederick

Defendants

Crowder, Sharnel

Does 1 through 20

Salaun, Richard

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael P Green

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel R Mayer

Christopher J Beeman

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Answer filed

Answer filed

Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed

Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/22/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demand for Jury Trial (and Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees) filed; Filed By: Salaun, Richard(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Salaun, Richard(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Change of Firm Name filed; Filed By: Crowder, Sharnel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Crowder, Sharnel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Crowder, Sharnel(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Henry, Frederick(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN MICHAEL PAUL