This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 13:44:31 (UTC).

Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation vs. G Dhillon Carriers Inc., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc , a Washington corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against G Dhillon Carriers Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3125

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation

Defendants

Does 1-10

G Dhillon Carriers Inc., a California corporation

Singh, Mandeep

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nick I Iezza

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Application - Other (for writ of possession) submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 02/09/2023

Application - Other (for writ of possession) submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 02/09/2023

Application for Writ of Possession submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 03/03/2023

Application for Writ of Possession submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 03/03/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application for Writ of Possession submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 03/03/2023; Filed By: Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application - Other (for writ of possession) submitted by Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation rejected on 02/09/2023; Filed By: Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Financial Pacific Leasing, Inc., a Washington corporation(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less