This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/20/2022 at 13:33:53 (UTC).

Felicia Saunders vs. Winco Holdings, Inc

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 Felicia Saunders filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Winco Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7520

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Saunders, Felicia

Defendants

Does 1-10

Kreuger, Nicolas

Winco Holdings, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Geoffrey C. Lyon

Defendant Attorney

Tiffany Tran

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Declaration - Other (of Nam for 30 Day Extension to File Demurrer) filed

Declaration - Other (of Nam for 30 Day Extension to File Demurrer) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Tran, Tiffany added as a effective 05/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Nam for 30 Day Extension to File Demurrer) filed; Filed By: Winco Holdings, Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/09/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Saunders, Felicia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Saunders, Felicia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Saunders, Felicia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 03/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Saunders, Felicia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Saunders, Felicia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINCO FOODS LLC is a litigant