This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 03:48:56 (UTC).

Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko vs. Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1157

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cherniienko, Nina

Cherniienko, Vasyl

Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko

Defendants

Magurean, Liviu

Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC

Magurean, Victor

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirill Tarasenko

Defendant Attorney

Joseph T Urbanic

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Amended Answer filed.

Amended Answer filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant); Magurean, Liviu(Defendant); Magurean, Victor(Defendant))

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to File Amended Answer to Complaint) filed.

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to File Amended Answer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Default denied as to Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC; Magurean, Victor; Magurean, Liviu on Complaint .

Default denied as to Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC; Magurean, Victor; Magurean, Liviu on Complaint .

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant); Magurean, Liviu(Defendant); Magurean, Victor(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant); Magurean, Liviu(Defendant); Magurean, Victor(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Granting Stipulation for Leave to File Amended Answer) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to File Amended Answer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketUrbanic, Joseph T added as a effective 08/19/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC(Defendant); Magurean, Liviu(Defendant); Magurean, Victor(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault denied as to Dunk N'Run Donuts, LLC; Magurean, Victor; Magurean, Liviu on Complaint .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/26/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cherniienko, Nina(Plaintiff); Cherniienko, Vasyl(Plaintiff); Estate of Borys Cherniienko by and through successors in interest Nina Cherniienko and Vasyl Cherniienko(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirill Tarasenko