This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 01:46:15 (UTC).

Eric Patrick vs. San Juan Unified School District

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Eric Patrick filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against San Juan Unified School District. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1556

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick, Eric

Defendants

San Juan Unified School District

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint (First) filed; Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 06/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Patrick, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less