This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/28/2023 at 11:45:12 (UTC).

Eric A Roscoe vs. FCA US LLC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Eric A Roscoe filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6836

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roscoe, Eric A.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Folsom Lake Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

FCA US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Walsh

Spencer P Hugret

 

Court Documents

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference - Settled filed

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference - Settled filed

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/15/2021 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 01/15/2021 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/17/2021 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/17/2021 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/10/2020 11:59:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/10/2020 11:59:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2020 01:30:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2020 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 08/19/2020 09:00:00 AM .

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Plntf's Attorney's Fees) filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Plntf's Attorney's Fees) filed

Proof of Service filed

Proof of Service filed

Declaration - Other (of Payam Shahian ISO Motion) filed

Declaration - Other (of Payam Shahian ISO Motion) filed

Declaration - Other (of Zavig Mkrdech ISO Motion for Attorneys' Fes) filed

Declaration - Other (of Zavig Mkrdech ISO Motion for Attorneys' Fes) filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Request - Judicial Notice filed

Exhibit List (Index of Exhibits) filed

Exhibit List (Index of Exhibits) filed

Motion for Attorney Fees filed

Motion for Attorney Fees filed

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed

Notice of Conditional Settlement filed

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Trial, and Related Dates; Proposed Order) submitted by Roscoe, Eric A rejected on 11/02/2022

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Trial, and Related Dates; Proposed Order) submitted by Roscoe, Eric A rejected on 11/02/2022

108 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Regarding Plntf's Attorney's Fees) filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Payam Shahian ISO Motion) filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (of Zavig Mkrdech ISO Motion for Attorneys' Fes) filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Judicial Notice filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Exhibit List (Index of Exhibits) filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion for Attorney Fees filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Conditional Settlement filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
157 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demurrer (to the Sixth Cause of Action of Pltfs Complaint) filed; Filed By: FCA US LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other (in Support of Defendants Good Faith to Meet and Confer) filed; Filed By: FCA US LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Roscoe, Eric(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less