This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 13:36:36 (UTC).

Equity Law Group vs. Nancy L Clemmer

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Equity Law Group filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nancy L Clemmer. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1531

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Equity Law Group

Defendants

Clemmer, Nancy L.

Does 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

S David Kozich

 

Court Documents

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Ex Parte Application - Other (To restrain funds) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (To restrain funds) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of David Kozich) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of David Kozich) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Eyad Yaser) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Eyad Yaser) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of ex parte notice) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of ex parte notice) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Proposed Order filed.

Proposed Order filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (To restrain funds) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of David Kozich) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Eyad Yaser) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of ex parte notice) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Equity Law Group(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EQUITY LAW GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOZICH S. DAVID