This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 13:34:30 (UTC).

Emoni Whittaker vs. Walmart Inc, a Delaware corporation

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Emoni Whittaker filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc, a Delaware corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7287

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Whittaker, Emoni

Defendants

Does 1-25

Walmart Inc, a Delaware corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Aldrich

Matthew A Zavala

Defendant Attorney

David A Melton

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Walmart Inc, a Delaware corporation(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Whittaker, Emoni(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Whittaker, Emoni(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Whittaker, Emoni(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Whittaker, Emoni(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Whittaker, Emoni(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zavala, Matthew

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aldrich, George