This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/04/2020 at 13:31:54 (UTC).

Emily Cheng vs. Board of Trustees of The California State University

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Emily Cheng filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Board of Trustees of The California State University. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8946

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cheng, Kevin

Cheng, Emily

Tang, Lihua

Defendants

Board of Trustees of The California State University

Does 1-100

Reginato, Justin

Nelson, Robert S.

White, Timothy P.

Guardian Ad Litem

Cheng, Mingyu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shanie N Bradley

 

Court Documents

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Cheng, Emily rejected on 11/14/2019 .

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Cheng, Emily rejected on 11/14/2019 . (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 3) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 3) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff); Tang, Lihua(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 3) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketReginato, Justin added as a Defendant effective 11/26/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 2) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketWhite, Timothy P added as a Defendant effective 11/26/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 1) filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNelson, Robert S added as a Defendant effective 11/26/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCheng, Mingyu added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 11/26/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem submitted by Cheng, Emily rejected on 11/14/2019 . (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/14/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Cheng, Emily(Plaintiff); Cheng, Kevin(Plaintiff); Tang, Lihua(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shanie N Bradley