This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 13:32:25 (UTC).

Ema Rosales vs. Crawford and Company

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Ema Rosales filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Crawford and Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8801

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosales, Ema

Defendants

Does 1-10

Crawford and Company

Broadspire Insurance Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Valerie Toohey O'Dell

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Broadspire Insurance Services, Inc.(Defendant); Crawford and Company(Defendant))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Broadspire Insurance Services, Inc.(Defendant); Crawford and Company(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/18/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rosales, Ema(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less