This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/07/2021 at 13:32:27 (UTC).

Elena Baker vs. Evan S Hymas

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 Elena Baker filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Evan S Hymas. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2756

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker

Baker, Elena

Defendants

Does 1 through 30

Hymas II, Steven B.

Hymas, Evan S.

Hymas, Melissa S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brad A Schultz

Defendant Attorney

Ian A Schaeffer

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Case Management Conference) filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSchaeffer, Ian A added as a effective 07/29/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Hymas, Evan(Defendant); Hymas, Melissa(Defendant); Hymas, Steven(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketApplication for Guardian Ad Litem forwarded to L&M on 6/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Angelica Saldana individually and Successor-In-Interest to the Estate of Brock A Baker(Plaintiff); Baker, Elena(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less