This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/17/2022 at 21:19:42 (UTC).

Edwin Quijana vs. Jane A Shepler

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 Edwin Quijana filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Jane A Shepler. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5398

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Quijana, Criselda

Quijana, Edwin

Defendants

all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right title estate lien or interest in the Complaint adverse to Plantiffs' title or any cloud upon Plaintiffs' title thereto

Does 1-100

Shepler, Jane A.

Beneficial California Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas A Trapani

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff))

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff))

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Notice of Pendency of Action filed

Notice of Pendency of Action filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Beneficial California Inc added as a Defendant effective 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Pendency of Action filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Pendency of Action filed; Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Pendency of Action filed; Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Quijana, Criselda(Plaintiff); Quijana, Edwin(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beneficial California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAPANI, THOMAS A