Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 21:06:46 (UTC).

E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation vs. Pestmaster Services, Inc., a California corporation

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 E J Gallo Winery, a California corporation filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pestmaster Services, Inc , a California corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6704

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation

Defendants

Van Diepen, Jeffrey M.

Pestmaster Services, Inc., a California corporation

United States Of America

Does 1-20

Pestmaster Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Fallek

Gregory S Mason

 

Court Documents

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Summons (To First Amended Complaint) filed.

Summons (To First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPestmaster Services LLC added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDoes 1-20 added as a Defendant effective 10/22/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons (To First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/15/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: E. & J. Gallo Winery, a California corporation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pestmaster Services is a litigant

Latest cases where E. & J. Gallo Winery is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MASON, GREGORY S