This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 07/16/2022 at 00:41:05 (UTC).

Dorothy Takahashi vs. Delta Stewardship Council

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Dorothy Takahashi filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Delta Stewardship Council. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9632

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Takahashi, Dorothy

Defendants

Delta Stewardship Council

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

Defendant Attorney

Michael Purcell

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff))

Answer filed

Answer filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM

34-2020-00289632-CU-OE-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2018-00232084-CU-NP-GDS on 02/15/2022

34-2020-00289632-CU-OE-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2018-00232084-CU-NP-GDS on 02/15/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: 34-2020-00289632-CU-OE-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2018-00232084-CU-NP-GDS on 02/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/14/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Delta Stewardship Council(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Purcell, Micahel added as a effective 09/09/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Delta Stewardship Council(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Takahashi, Dorothy(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less