This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 21:06:41 (UTC).

Destiney James vs. Language World Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 Destiney James filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Language World Services, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9929

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James, Destiney

Defendants

Language World Services, Inc.

Cares Community Health

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Galen T Shimoda

Defendant Attorneys

Joan C Woodard

Ronald E Enabnit

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Language World Services, Inc.(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Cares Community Health(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketWoodard, Joan C added as a effective 08/31/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Language World Services, Inc.(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Cares Community Health(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/05/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: James, Destiney(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shimoda, Galen T