This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 00:07:19 (UTC).

Department of Parks and Recreation vs. Fresno County Economic Opportunities Commission, a non-profit corporation

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 Department of Parks and Recreation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fresno County Economic Opportunities Commission, a non-profit corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0070

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Department of Parks and Recreation

Defendants

Fresno County Economic Opportunities Commission, a non-profit corporation

Does 1-50, inclusive

Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission

Cross Defendant

Roes 1-25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeremy Brown

Defendant Attorney

Timothy Jones

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/04/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/04/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Judgment (of Dismissal after Sustaining of Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed.

Judgment (of Dismissal after Sustaining of Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/24/2019 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/24/2019 09:00:00 AM .

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed.

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Christofferson iso Oppo to Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Christofferson iso Oppo to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Notice of Errata (re: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission's Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed.

Notice of Errata (re: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission's Second Amended Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Jeremy Brown ISO Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jeremy Brown ISO Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Amended Cross-Complaint (Second) filed.

Amended Cross-Complaint (Second) filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/04/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/04/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 09/25/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 09/25/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.

Reply to Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opp to the Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opp to the Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

Declaration - Other (of Jay A Christofferson ISO Opp to the Demurrer) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jay A Christofferson ISO Opp to the Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Cross - Complainant))

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketJudgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 11/09/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 09/21/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment (of Dismissal after Sustaining of Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 01/24/2019 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Opposition (to Demurrer to Second Amended Cross Complaint for Breach of Contract) filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRoes 1-25 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 05/23/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Fresno Economic Opportunities Commission(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketJones, Timothy added as a effective 05/23/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/04/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 04/02/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Department of Parks and Recreation(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jones, Timothy