This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 20:25:00 (UTC).

Davona Alfred vs. JAMV Inc

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 Davona Alfred filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JAMV Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9868

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alfred, Davona

Defendants

JAMV Inc

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy B Del Castillo

Kent L Bradbury

Defendant Attorney

Katherine Kimsey

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed.

Proof of Service (Electronic Service) filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic Service) filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketKimsey, Katherine added as a effective 07/16/2020 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: JAMV Inc(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/17/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Alfred, Davona(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamv, Inc. dba Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, a California Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradbury, Kent L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Del Castillo, Timothy B.