Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 13:32:27 (UTC).

Dashay P. Scott vs. Loomis Armored US, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Dashay P Scott filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Loomis Armored US, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7934

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott, Dashay P.

On behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendants

Loomis Armored US, LLC

Does 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Edward Cole

 

Court Documents

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Notice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed. (Filed By: Loomis Armored US, LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDesignated a complex action on 04/28/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to 40 effective 04/15/2021 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Order of Complex Case Determination filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: On behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Scott, Dashay(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 47 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOOMIS ARMORED US, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where on behalf of all others similarly situated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLE, SCOTT EDWARD