This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 20:19:39 (UTC).

Dannette Mccalman vs. David Scott Wilkins

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Dannette Mccalman filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against David Scott Wilkins. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4702

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mccalman, Dannette

Defendants

Whodat Towers LLC

Sole Proprietorships and/or Joint Venturess I-X

Wilkins, David Scott

XYZ Partnerships

ABC Corporations I-X

Does III-V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher D. Burk

Defendant Attorney

Dana B Denno

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff))

Order - Other filed.

Order - Other filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Demand for Jury Trial filed

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/21/2021 09:00:00 AM

Minutes finalized for heard on 12/21/2021 09:00:00 AM

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/19/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Whodat Towers LLC(Defendant); Wilkins, David(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/04/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demand for Jury Trial filed; Filed By: Whodat Towers LLC(Defendant); Wilkins, David(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Whodat Towers LLC(Defendant); Wilkins, David(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Mccalman, Dannette(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XYZ PARTNERSHIPS is a litigant