This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/16/2022 at 00:06:25 (UTC).

Daniel Pickering vs. Divine Savior Catholic Church

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Daniel Pickering filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Divine Savior Catholic Church. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1271

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pickering, Daniel

Defendants

Diocese of Sacramento

Divine Savior Catholic Church

Does 1-100

Pastor of Divine Savior Parish, Orangevale

Roman Catholic Bishop of Sacramento

The Catholic Foundation of the Diocese of Sacramento, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William S Ginsburg

Defendant Attorney

Stephen J Greene, Jr

 

Court Documents

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/25/2022 08:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/25/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Pastor of Divine Savior Parish, Orangevale(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Pickering, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ROMAN CATHOLIC BISHOP OF SACRAMENTO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GINSBURG, WILLIAM S