This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 14:23:01 (UTC).

Daniel Artherton vs. City of Folsom

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 Daniel Artherton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of Folsom. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3406

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Artherton, Daniel

Defendants

City of Folsom

County of Sacramento

Sierra Traffic Markings, Inc.

Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC

Westland Capital Partners, L.P.

Goodfellow Bros. LLC, a Washington limited liability company

Does 1-100

Eagle Commercial Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company

California Department of Transportation

Cargini Investors, LLC a California limited liability company

East Carpenter Improvement Company, LLC a California limited liabiliyy company

Enclave at Folsom Ranch, LLC a California limited liability company

Folsom Chamber of Commerce

Mackay & Somps Civil Engineers, Inc. a California corporation

Siino, Elizabeth

Cross Defendants

Butcher, Kelley

Moes 1-25

Roes 1 to 50

Roes 1-20

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael R Kelly

Defendant Attorneys

Alison J Southard

Stephen E Horan

William E. Camy

John P Hallissy

Steven C Toschi

Mark R Wetters

Will Lemkul

Michael Malady

Bruce N. Furukawa

Cross Defendant Attorney

Michael Dean Michel

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/28/2022 08:30:00 AM published

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/28/2022 08:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/28/2022 08:30:00 AM

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 57) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 57) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 56) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 56) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 55) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 55) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 54) filed

Complaint - Doe Amendment (Doe 54) filed

Answer (to Cross-Complaint of Enclave at Folsom Ranch, LLC) filed

Answer (to Cross-Complaint of Enclave at Folsom Ranch, LLC) filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

Mediation Statement filed

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/28/2022 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program continued to 01/13/2023 at 08:30 in this department

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program rescheduled to 01/13/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Cargini Investors, LLC a California limited liability company added as a Defendant effective 01/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice - Other (of Addresses for Electronic Service) filed; Filed By: Westland Capital Partners, L.P.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Demand for Jury Trial filed; Filed By: Westland Capital Partners, L.P.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Westland Capital Partners, L.P.(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Artherton, Daniel(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goodfellow Bros. LLC, a Washington limited liability company is a litigant

Latest cases where City of Folsom is a litigant

Latest cases where Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant