This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 00:47:08 (UTC).

Daniel Aron Williams vs. Gary Lloyd Circle

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Daniel Aron Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gary Lloyd Circle. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5207

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Williams, Daniel Aron

Williams, Lorrie Ann

Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams

Williamson, Anne

Defendants

Does 1-10

County of Sacramento

City of Rancho Cordova

Bills, Adam Daniel

Circle, Gary Lloyd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A Carichoff

Defendant Attorneys

William E. Camy

Steven Tsuyuki

Eric M Bonzell

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Rancho Cordova(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Cross - Complainant))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

Answer (To Complaint) filed.

Answer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.

Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCamy, William E. added as a effective 11/03/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Rancho Cordova(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bills, Adam(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/22/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Pamela W. Martin, individually and as successor in interest to the Estate of Janice Kay Williams(Plaintiff); Williams, Daniel(Plaintiff); Williams, Lorrie(Plaintiff); Williamson, Anne(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 43 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Rancho Cordova is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARICHOFF, ROBERT A.