This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 00:31:58 (UTC).

CUMMINGS, DOUG vs. CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION et al.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 CUMMINGS, DOUG filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Sacramento County Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1248

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUMMINGS, DOUG

Defendants

CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

COPELAND CORPORATION LLC

Not Yet Classified

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

CT CORPORATION SYSTEMS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration Issued

Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration Issued

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Hearing Date - Rescheduled

Hearing Date - Rescheduled

Correspondence Received

Correspondence Received

Correspondence Returned to Party

Correspondence Returned to Party

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Motion Other - Filed

Motion Other - Filed

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Correspondence Returned to Party

Correspondence Returned to Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed Claim Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: COPELAND CORPORATION LLC; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: CUMMINGS, DOUG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: COPELAND CORPORATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Date - Rescheduled; Hearing: 11/29/2022 8:15:00 AM; Type: General Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Returned to Party; For: CUMMINGS, DOUG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dropped from Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion Other - Filed; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION; Hearing: 9/19/2022 8:15:00 AM; Type: Motion Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Returned to Party; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: COPELAND CORPORATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: CUMMINGS, DOUG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: CLIMATE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of In-person and Remote Hearing; For: COPELAND CORPORATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Small Claims Subpoena and Declaration Issued; For: CUMMINGS, DOUG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000; Hearing: 9/19/2022 8:15:00 AM; Type: General Case; Fee details; Fees Paid: $50.00; Deferred: $0.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where COPELAND CORPORATION LLC is a litigant