This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 13:33:00 (UTC).

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. vs. Michael Gash

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Gash. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3802

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Gash, Michael

Trosky Elite Painting, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Jyoo

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Amended Complaint (Doe 1) filed

Amended Complaint (Doe 1) filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Gash, Michael added as a Defendant effective 03/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint (Doe 1) filed; Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less