Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 13:33:04 (UTC).

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. vs. HW Maintenance LAX LLC

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HW Maintenance LAX LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4789

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.

Defendants

Does 1-10

HW Maintenance LAX LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Freed

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 585(d) ; Fax Signature per C.R.C 2.305(d)) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 585(d) ; Fax Signature per C.R.C 2.305(d)) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Kenneth J. Freed RE Attorney's Fees Pursuant Civil Code Section 1717.5, Interest and Costs in Support of Default Judgment) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Kenneth J. Freed RE Attorney's Fees Pursuant Civil Code Section 1717.5, Interest and Costs in Support of Default Judgment) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (Assignment) filed.

Notice - Other (Assignment) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Request - Court Judgment filed.

Request - Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Court Judgment filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Assignment) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Kenneth J. Freed RE Attorney's Fees Pursuant Civil Code Section 1717.5, Interest and Costs in Support of Default Judgment) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Pursuant to C.C.P. Section 585(d) ; Fax Signature per C.R.C 2.305(d)) filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Default entered as to HW Maintenance LAX LLC on Complaint .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 23 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/20/2018 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HW MAINTENANCE LAX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY