This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 14:01:38 (UTC).

Cooper Scott Thornton vs. Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 Cooper Scott Thornton filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6543

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charter, Jodi

Thornton, Cooper Scott

Defendants

Connolly, Gregory

Lamigo, Jerry

Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation

Does 1-50

Thomas, Tyler

Connolly, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin A Hughey

Defendant Attorney

Paul Kissel

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/08/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/08/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

Declaration - Other (of Hughey iso Motion to Compel) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Hughey iso Motion to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Pltfs Depo Sub for Production of Business Records) filed.

Motion to Compel - Other (Responses to Pltfs Depo Sub for Production of Business Records) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Mitchell A De Anda ISO plfs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Mitchell A De Anda ISO plfs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs) filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Withdrawing Motion for Attorney fees) filed.

Notice - Other (of Withdrawing Motion for Attorney fees) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Jonathan P Geen ISO Supplemental Brief ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jonathan P Geen ISO Supplemental Brief ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Connolly, Elizabeth(Defendant); Connolly, Gregory(Defendant); Lamigo, Jerry(Defendant); Thomas, Tyler(Defendant); Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Cooper Thornton iSO Oppo to Mtn to Compel Arb) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Cooper Thornton iSO Oppo to Mtn to Compel Arb) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Jodi Charter ISO Oppo to Mtn to Compel) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Jodi Charter ISO Oppo to Mtn to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Notice of Lodging filed.

Notice of Lodging filed. (Filed By: Connolly, Elizabeth(Defendant); Connolly, Gregory(Defendant); Lamigo, Jerry(Defendant); Thomas, Tyler(Defendant); Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Mary Lao ISO Plf SurReply to Def Motion to Compel Arbitration Under the Federal Arbitration Act, or Alternaatively Under the California Arbitration Act and to Stay all case Proceeedings Pending Arbitration) filed.

Declaration - Other (Mary Lao ISO Plf SurReply to Def Motion to Compel Arbitration Under the Federal Arbitration Act, or Alternaatively Under the California Arbitration Act and to Stay all case Proceeedings Pending Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Notice of Lodging (ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration Under the Federal Arbitration Act or Alternatively, Under the California Arbitration Act and to Stay all Case Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed.

Notice of Lodging (ISO Motion to Compel Arbitration Under the Federal Arbitration Act or Alternatively, Under the California Arbitration Act and to Stay all Case Proceedings Pending Arbitration) filed. (Filed By: Connolly, Elizabeth(Defendant); Connolly, Gregory(Defendant); Lamigo, Jerry(Defendant); Thomas, Tyler(Defendant); Trifecta Inc a Wyoming corporation(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion heard on 04/08/2019 02:00:00 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/21/2019 02:00:00 PM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Withdrawing Motion for Attorney fees) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Withdrawing Motion to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Case assigned to Department 23 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Charter, Jodi(Plaintiff); Thornton, Cooper(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less