This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 16:27:42 (UTC).

City of Elk Grove vs. Arntz Builders Inc

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 City of Elk Grove filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arntz Builders Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0554

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Elk Grove

Defendants

Willdan Engineering

Big D Construction Inc

Swa Sausalito

Arntz Builders Inc

Does 1-50

Big B Construction Inc

Swa Group

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Swa Sausalito

Roebbelen Construction Management Services Inc

Roes 1-100

Roes 1-30

Roes 1-50

Roebbelen Contracting Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W Tyra

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen M. Rhoads

John S Poulos

Matthew S Constantino

Bob Sims

Samuel J Muir

Stephen B Litchfield

Cross Defendant Attorney

Marcus L Turner

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/03/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Change of Venue - PJ Law and Motion set on 12/03/2019 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/16/2020 08:30:00 AM published .

Amended Complaint (First) filed.

Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) filed.

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Certificate of Merit) filed.

Declaration - Other (Certificate of Merit) filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed. (Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff))

Motion for Change of Venue filed.

Motion for Change of Venue filed. (Filed By: Swa Group(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Of Marco Esposito ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Marco Esposito ISO Motion to Transfer Venue) filed. (Filed By: Swa Group(Defendant))

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Arntz Builders Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Arntz Builders Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (To First Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (To First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Swa Group(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Swa Group(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.

Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Big B Construction Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Big B Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Big B Construction Inc(Cross - Complainant))

53 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketROA Entry: Receipt for Transfer of Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Mail Certified Receipt - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Contra Costa County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 03/02/2020 09:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/16/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case file contents transferred to receiving court Contra Costa pursuant to court order .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Transmittal of Papers and Pleadings - Change of Venue - Transfer out to Contra Costa County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Association of Attorney filed; Filed By: Swa Group(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply (to SWA Groups Opposition to joint demurrer) filed; Filed By: Roebbelen Construction Management Services Inc(Cross - Defendant); Roebbelen Contracting Inc(Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (To Demurrer) filed; Filed By: Swa Group(Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 01/16/2020 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Declaration - Other filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: City of Elk Grove(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROEBBELEN CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SWA GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Big-D Construction Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Big B Construction Inc is a litigant