This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/14/2022 at 16:59:19 (UTC).

CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS vs. CLARKE, EMERALD MAE et al.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLARKE, EMERALD MAE. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Carol Miller Justice Center located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0452

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

Defendants

SILVA, ANGEL JESUS

CLARKE, EMERALD MAE

 

Court Documents

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Correspondence Returned to Party

Correspondence Returned to Party

Correspondence Received

Correspondence Received

Hearing Outcome

Hearing Outcome

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - COP

Proof of Service - Non Estes

Proof of Service - Non Estes

Certified Mail Fee

Certified Mail Fee

Certified Mail Fee

Certified Mail Fee

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Judgment for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court Continuance - Court to Notify; Hearing: 8/5/2021 1:30:00 PM; Type: Government

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Returned to Party; For: CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Correspondence Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Authorization to Appear On Behalf of Party; For: CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Hearing Outcome

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court Continuance - Court to Notify; Hearing: 7/1/2021 1:30:00 PM; Type: Government

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: SILVA, ANGEL JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: CITY OF CITRUS HEIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: CLARKE, EMERALD MAE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Video Conference Hearing; For: SILVA, ANGEL JESUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: CLARKE, EMERALD MAE; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - COP; For: SILVA, ANGEL JESUS; Service Level: Valid; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service - Non Estes; For: CLARKE, EMERALD MAE; Service Level: Non Estes; Recoverable: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant > $1,500 and <= $5,000; Hearing: 5/6/2021 1:30:00 PM; Type: Government; Fee details; Fees Paid: $50.00; Deferred: $50.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Mail Fee; For: CLARKE, EMERALD MAE; Fee details; Fees Paid: $15.00; Deferred: $15.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Mail Fee; For: SILVA, ANGEL JESUS; Fee details; Fees Paid: $15.00; Deferred: $15.00; Waived: $0.00; Recoverable: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Citrus Heights is a litigant