This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 02/10/2021 at 20:52:12 (UTC).

Cit Bank N.A. vs. Lawrence Leventon

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Cit Bank N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Lawrence Leventon. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3616

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cit Bank N.A.

Defendants

All persons unknown, claiming any legal or equitable right, title, estate lien, or interest in the property described in the complaint adverse to plaintiff's title, or any cloud upon plaintiff's title thereto

Does 1-20

Leventon, Lawrence

Unknown Heirs of Lawrence Leventon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Razi-Jafari

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (ISO Application) filed.

Declaration - Other (ISO Application) filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed.

Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Order for Publication of Summons filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (ISO Application) filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketUnknown Heirs of Lawrence Leventon added as a Defendant effective 10/01/2020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (re: Initial CMC) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2021 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Cit Bank N.A.(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 31 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIT Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY