This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 13:31:04 (UTC).

Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California vs. United Business Bank

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California filed an Other lawsuit against United Business Bank. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6830

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California

Respondent

United Business Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Andrew M Steinheimer

 

Court Documents

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2019 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2019 09:00:00 AM .

Order After Hearing filed.

Order After Hearing filed.

Reply (Brief no Opp Received) filed.

Reply (Brief no Opp Received) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Compelling Compliance with Investigative Subpoena) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Compelling Compliance with Investigative Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing (On Petition to Compel) filed.

Notice of Hearing (On Petition to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (ISO Petition for Order to Compel) filed.

Declaration - Other (ISO Petition for Order to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Proposed Order (Compelling Compliance) filed.

Proposed Order (Compelling Compliance) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Petition to Compel) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Petition to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Petition for Hearing - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order After Hearing filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Civil Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2019 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply (Brief no Opp Received) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Petition for Hearing - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 11/14/2019 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 54 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO Petition to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Order (Compelling Compliance) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (ISO Petition for Order to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing (On Petition to Compel) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Department 54 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Compelling Compliance with Investigative Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: Christopher Shultz, Chief Deputy Director, Department of Consumer Affairs, State of California(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED BUSINESS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew M Steinheimer