This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 13:38:28 (UTC).

Cheyanne Police vs. Best Collateral, Inc

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Cheyanne Police filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Best Collateral, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0469

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Police, Cheyanne

Defendants

Best Collateral, Inc

Diane Samuel and Joe Samuel as Trustees of the Samuel Family Trust

Does 1-100

Goldman, Alan

Goldman, Marcia

Marcia Goldman and Alan Goldman as Trustees of the Goldman Family Trust

Samuel, Diane

Samuel, Joe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Azemika

Defendant Attorney

Gregory R. De La Pena

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 38; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Best Collateral, Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30 day Summons & Complaint - Notice of Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 09/01/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Police, Cheyanne(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less