This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 16:22:28 (UTC).

Chelsea Blake vs. Independent Artist Entertainment

Case Summary

On 08/01/2022 Chelsea Blake filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Independent Artist Entertainment. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4566

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blake, Chelsea

Defendants

Does 1-20

Gutierrez, Jairo

Independent Artist Entertainment

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy B Del Castillo

Defendant Attorney

Raina Singer

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 31; Status: Reassigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Singer, Raina added as a effective 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Gutierrez, Jairo(Defendant); Independent Artist Entertainment(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Blake, Chelsea(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Blake, Chelsea(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Blake, Chelsea(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 31 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Blake, Chelsea(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Blake, Chelsea(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SINGER RAINA