This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 11/04/2021 at 13:31:06 (UTC).

Charles Edward Thompson vs. Niello Bavarian Automobiles, Inc

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Charles Edward Thompson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Niello Bavarian Automobiles, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7799

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thompson III, Charles Edward

Defendants

Does 1-100

International Fidelity Insurance Company

Niello Bavarian Automobiles, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L Starr

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Statement of Venue filed.

Statement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Delay In Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Thompson, Charles(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 38 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Fidelity Ins Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARR ROBERT LORNE